NC H259 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Ch. SL 2015-268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Ch. SL 2015-268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
General Government Technical Corrections.-AB
Title
General Government Technical Corrections.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 4 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 3 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 3 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Ch. SL 2015-268 | |
2015-10-01 | Signed by Gov. 10/1/2015 | |
2015-10-01 | Pres. To Gov. 10/1/2015 | |
2015-09-30 | Ratified | |
2015-09-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-30 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA4 |
2015-09-30 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA3 |
2015-09-30 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA2 |
2015-09-30 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2015-09-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/30/2015 |
2015-09-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Com Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Com Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-18 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |