NC H258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Open Amusement Parks/Arcades/Venues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Amusement Parks/Arcades/Venues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - House - M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-07-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-07-02HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44.2
2020-07-02HouseReceived from the Governor
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2020
2020-06-24 Ratified
2020-06-23HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-23HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-19SenateEngrossed
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-17SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-13HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-05HouseRef to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S158 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H258
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H258v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/396
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/783
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/784
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/782
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/989
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/988

Bill Comments

feedback