NC H254 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Ch. SL 2013-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Ch. SL 2013-59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning Changes/Notice to Military Bases
Title
Zoning Changes/Notice to Military Bases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Ch. SL 2013-59 | |
2013-05-30 | Signed by Gov. 5/30/2013 | |
2013-05-22 | Pres. To Gov. 05/23/2013 | |
2013-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 5/23/2013 | |
2013-05-22 | Ratified | |
2013-05-21 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/21/2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 |
2013-05-15 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |