NC H252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Building Code Regulatory Reform
Title
Building Code Regulatory Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - A2 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - A2 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-130 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-03-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-06 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S371 (Same As) 2017-04-10 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate