NC H247 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Standards of Student Conduct
Title
Standards of Student Conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - A1 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Corporal Punishment
Education
Education Administration
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Government Employees
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Minors
Occupations
Principals
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Reporting
Restraining Devices
Secondary Education
State Employees
Student Discipline
Students
Teachers
Corporal Punishment
Education
Education Administration
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Government Employees
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Minors
Occupations
Principals
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Reporting
Restraining Devices
Secondary Education
State Employees
Student Discipline
Students
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 390.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 390.9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 391.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 208.18 | (n/a) | Citation Text |