NC H247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limit Soldiers' Community College Tuition
Title
Limit Soldiers' Community College Tuition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-15 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2017-03-06 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |