NC H240 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Albemarle/City Labor for Business Ctr

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Albemarle/City Labor for Business Ctr

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-04HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback