NC H24 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Unfunded Liability/Retiree Health Fund
Title
Study Unfunded Liability/Retiree Health Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] | Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. Beverly Earle [D] |
Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-30 | House | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2017-01-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S22 (Same As) 2017-04-27 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate