NC H230 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

NC Managing Environmental Waste Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Managing Environmental Waste Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-26SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-21HousePlaced On Cal For 04/22/2021
2021-04-21HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-21HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-20HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-23HouseRe-ref Com On Environment
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-08HouseRef to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback