NC H229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

GSC Technical Corrections 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GSC Technical Corrections 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Ch. SL 2017-102
2017-07-12 Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
2017-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
2017-06-28 Ratified
2017-06-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-27HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2017
2017-06-26HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-26HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2017
2017-06-22SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-13SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-25HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-21HousePlaced On Cal For 04/24/2017
2017-04-21HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-21HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-03-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S582 (Same As) 2017-10-08 - Ch. SL 2017-212

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H229&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H229v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H229v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H229v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H229v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H229v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=287
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=335
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=727

Bill Comments

feedback