NC H228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Ch. SL 2017-23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Ch. SL 2017-23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Postpone Assumed Name Revisions
Title
Postpone Assumed Name Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Ch. SL 2017-23 | |
2017-06-02 | Signed by Gov. 6/2/2017 | |
2017-05-25 | Pres. To Gov. 5/25/2017 | |
2017-05-24 | Ratified | |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-02 | House | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S566 (Same As) 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-107