NC H226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flex/Mecklenburg County
Title
School Calendar Flex/Mecklenburg County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S189 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Boards
Calendar
Charlotte
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Mecklenburg County
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Calendar
Charlotte
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Mecklenburg County
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |