NC H224 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Ch. SL 2021-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Ch. SL 2021-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational Therapy Interstate Compact
Title
Occupational Therapy Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Ch. SL 2021-31 | |
2021-06-11 | Signed by Gov. 6/11/2021 | |
2021-06-08 | Pres. To Gov. 6/8/2021 | |
2021-06-07 | Ratified | |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/03/2021 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S173 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Chaptered
Compacts
Employment
Health Services
Interstate Cooperation
Occupational Therapy
Presented
Public
Ratified
Compacts
Employment
Health Services
Interstate Cooperation
Occupational Therapy
Presented
Public
Ratified
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 270.180 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.181 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.182 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.183 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.184 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.185 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.186 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.187 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.188 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.189 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.190 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.191 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.192 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 270.193 | (n/a) | Citation Text |