NC H223 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Ch. SL 2009-60
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Ch. SL 2009-60
Summary
No High School Graduation Proj. Required.
Title
No High School Graduation Proj. Required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Ch. SL 2009-60 | |
2009-06-05 | Signed By Gov. 6/5/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Pres. To Gov. 6/2/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Ratified | |
2009-05-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-19 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H223 |