NC H211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Conf Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Various DMV Changes.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various DMV Changes.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - A1 Speciale Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - A2 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-09-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/11/2019
2019-09-10SenateConf Com Reported
2019-07-10SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-09HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-08HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-07-04HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-04HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-02HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-02SenateEngrossed
2019-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-03HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-04-03HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-27HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-03-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H211
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H211v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/119
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/118
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/117
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/419
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/418
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/574
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/589

Bill Comments

feedback