NC H208 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Ch. SL 2017-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Ch. SL 2017-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occup. Therapy/Choice of Provider
Title
Occup. Therapy/Choice of Provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Ch. SL 2017-24 | |
2017-06-02 | Signed by Gov. 6/2/2017 | |
2017-05-25 | Pres. To Gov. 5/25/2017 | |
2017-05-24 | Ratified | |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-01 | House | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S307 (Same As) 2017-04-13 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate