NC H203 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage Satisfaction Forms/No False Liens
Title
Mortgage Satisfaction Forms/No False Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-150 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-28 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-28 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-27 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-26 | Amendment Withdrawn 2 | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-06-02 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2011-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-02 | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |