NC H200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Lifetime Concealed Handgun Permit
Title
Lifetime Concealed Handgun Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Corrected Copy Committee Substitute Ordered |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Concealed Carry
Counties
Emergency Services
Fees
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Personnel
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Sheriffs
Weapons
Concealed Carry
Counties
Emergency Services
Fees
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Personnel
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Sheriffs
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 415.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 415.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 415.16A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 415.17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 415.18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 415.19 | (n/a) | Citation Text |