NC H198 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

City & County Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City & County Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29 Ch. SL 2017-81
2017-06-29 Ratified
2017-06-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-29HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-06-28HousePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2017
2017-06-28HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-28SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-03-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-03-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-03-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-03-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-03-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-03-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-02-28HouseRef To Com On State and Local Government I
2017-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S122 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Ch. SL 2017-43

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback