NC H193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Greensboro/Small Business Enterprise

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greensboro/Small Business Enterprise

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-10HousePlaced On Cal For 04/11/2019
2019-04-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-20HouseRe-ref Com On Commerce
2019-03-20HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S166 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback