NC H19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Organizational Meeting/Local Elected Boards
Title
Organizational Meeting/Local Elected Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - A1 Davis Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - A1 Davis Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-02-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/22/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |