NC H184 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Ch. SL 2015-218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Ch. SL 2015-218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Change DCR Process for Unclaimed Property.-AB
Title
Change DCR Process for Unclaimed Property.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - A1 Brown, R. Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - A1 Brown, R. Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | Ch. SL 2015-218 | |
2015-08-18 | Signed by Gov. 8/18/2015 | |
2015-08-12 | Pres. To Gov. 8/12/2015 | |
2015-08-11 | Ratified | |
2015-08-10 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-10 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-08-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/10/2015 |
2015-08-06 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-08-05 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-08-04 | Engrossed | |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/02/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-03-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |