NC H181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
First Responders Act of 2017
Title
First Responders Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] |
Rep. James Boles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Judiciary III, if favorable, Transportation |
2017-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |