NC H178 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Access to Prescription Drug Cost Information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Prescription Drug Cost Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-01HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback