NC H177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Spiking Moratorium/LGERS Surety
Title
Extend Spiking Moratorium/LGERS Surety
Sponsors
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. William Brisson [R] |
Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Ch. SL 2022-70 | |
2022-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2022-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-23 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S159 (Same As) 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-125
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Contracts
Council Of State
Disabled Persons
Government Employees
Health
Insurance
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Minors
Moratoriums
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Reporting
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Health Plan Board
State Treasurer
Teachers
Chaptered
Contracts
Council Of State
Disabled Persons
Government Employees
Health
Insurance
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Minors
Moratoriums
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Reporting
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Health Plan Board
State Treasurer
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
128 | 23 | (n/a) | Citation Text |