NC H175 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ret. & Treasury Tech. Corrections Act of 2021.-AB
Title
Ret. & Treasury Tech. Corrections Act of 2021.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-10 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S277 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Ch. SL 2021-60
Subjects
Attorneys
Commissions
Council Of State
Court Costs & Fees
Courts
Fees
Government Employees
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Occupations
Public
Public Officials
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Commissions
Council Of State
Court Costs & Fees
Courts
Fees
Government Employees
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Occupations
Public
Public Officials
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
116D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116D | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159 | 13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
161 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
161 | 50.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
84 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
84 | 4.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |