NC H172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Term Limits for Congress
Title
Term Limits for Congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-03-17 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/17/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/10/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Constitution
Elections
Joint
Memorializing Resolutions
National Elections
Public Officials
Resolutions
Term Lengths & Limits
Us
Elections
Joint
Memorializing Resolutions
National Elections
Public Officials
Resolutions
Term Lengths & Limits
Us
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
C | V-2. | (n/a) | Citation Text |