NC H165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Ch. SL 2021-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Ch. SL 2021-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
DOT Legislative Changes.-AB
Title
DOT Legislative Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-23 | Ch. SL 2021-185 | |
2021-11-23 | Signed by Gov. 11/23/2021 | |
2021-11-18 | Pres. To Gov. 11/18/2021 | |
2021-11-18 | Ratified | |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-17 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-11-17 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-17 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-11-16 | House | Conferees Changed |
2021-11-15 | House | Conferees Changed |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-10-07 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-10-07 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/07/2021 |
2021-10-06 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-10-06 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Admin. Hearings Office
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Appropriations
Authorities
Boards
Budgeting
Cameras
Carteret County
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Coastal Resources
Commerce
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Disabled Persons
Dmv
Durham
Durham County
Dwi
Education
Electronic Government
Elementary Education
Fees
Ferries
Funds & Accounts
Highway Fund
Human Trafficking
Hyde County
Information Technology
Infrastructure
Insurance
Internet
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Notification
Parking & Parking Structures
Ports
Ports Authority
Presented
Privatization
Public
Public-private Partnerships
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Roads & Highways
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Shipping
Smuggling & Trafficking
Studies
Toll Roads & Bridges
Traffic Cameras
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Turnpike Authority Board
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Appropriations
Authorities
Boards
Budgeting
Cameras
Carteret County
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Coastal Resources
Commerce
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Disabled Persons
Dmv
Durham
Durham County
Dwi
Education
Electronic Government
Elementary Education
Fees
Ferries
Funds & Accounts
Highway Fund
Human Trafficking
Hyde County
Information Technology
Infrastructure
Insurance
Internet
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Notification
Parking & Parking Structures
Ports
Ports Authority
Presented
Privatization
Public
Public-private Partnerships
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Roads & Highways
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Shipping
Smuggling & Trafficking
Studies
Toll Roads & Bridges
Traffic Cameras
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Turnpike Authority Board
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
136 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
136 | 189.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 28.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 28.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 89.199 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 215.73F | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 109.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 17.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 176 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 309.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 311 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 320 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 329 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 37.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |