NC H159 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education Law Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Law Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2021-06-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-28SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-16SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-06-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-05SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-05HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-01HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-04-01HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-01HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-01HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-03-31HousePlaced On Cal For 04/01/2021
2021-03-31HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-31HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-09HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2021-03-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-01HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H159
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H159v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1113/0/H159-PCS30148-RQa-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2202/0/H159-PCS10227-RQ-8
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2302/0/H159-ARQ-26-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52141/0/H159-PCS10510-TC-43
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52405/0/H159-PCS10517-TC-46
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMRQ-8(CSRQa-3)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMRQ-29(CSRQ-8)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMRQ-31(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMTC-104(CSTC-43)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMTC-105(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMRB-27(e5)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H159-SMTC-118(CSTC-46)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/86

Bill Comments 750

feedback