NC H159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School TSERS Election
Title
Charter School TSERS Election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - A1 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - A1 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Ch. SL 2017-98 | |
2017-07-12 | Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/27/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/23/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2017-03-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |