NC H158 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-04 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-04 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Const. Amend./Life at Fertilization
Title
Const. Amend./Life at Fertilization
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-04 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
C | I-to | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H158 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H158v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H158v1.pdf |