NC H151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Ch. SL 2017-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Stanly Cty/Economic Development Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stanly Cty/Economic Development Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20 Ch. SL 2017-35
2017-06-20 Ratified
2017-06-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-19HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-06-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-19HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-16HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-16SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-06-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-05-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-05-18SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-03-02HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-03-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-03-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-03-01HousePlaced On Cal For 03/02/2017
2017-03-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-03-01HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-02-22HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government I
2017-02-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-02-22HouseRef To Com On State and Local Government II
2017-02-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-21HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H151&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H151v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=52
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=643

Bill Comments

feedback