NC H148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
SBI Emergency Pen Register/Trap and Trace
Title
SBI Emergency Pen Register/Trap and Trace
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Dudley Greene [R] |
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S645 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Ale
Investigations
Law Enforcement
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Sbi
Ale
Investigations
Law Enforcement
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Sbi
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
15A | 260 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 261 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 263 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 265 | (n/a) | Citation Text |