NC H146 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Advance Health Care Directives Laws
Title
Amend Advance Health Care Directives Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] |
Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-01 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-26 | House | Postponed To 04/01/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Postponed To 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Postponed To 03/25/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Postponed To 03/24/2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-04 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |