NC H145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property Protection Act/DVPO
Title
Property Protection Act/DVPO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commerce
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Family Issues
Judges
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Property
Public
Retailing
Sales & Conveyances
Seized & Forfeited Property
Sheriffs
Storage Systems
Weapons
Women
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Family Issues
Judges
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Property
Public
Retailing
Sales & Conveyances
Seized & Forfeited Property
Sheriffs
Storage Systems
Weapons
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
50B | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |