NC H143 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charlotte/Civil Service Board
Title
Charlotte/Civil Service Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Ch. SL 2015-33 | |
2015-05-21 | Ratified | |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | House | Postponed To 03/24/2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/23/2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-04 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |