NC H142 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Ch. SL 2021-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

UNC Building Reserves/Certain Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNC Building Reserves/Certain Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Ch. SL 2021-19
2021-05-07 Signed by Gov. 5/7/2021
2021-05-07 Pres. To Gov. 5/7/2021
2021-05-06 Ratified
2021-05-05SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-05-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-29SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-19SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-05SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-05HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-01HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-01HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-01HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-31HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-31HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-25HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S130 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback