NC H140 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Ch. SL 2023-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Ch. SL 2023-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Civilian Traffic Investigators
Title
Civilian Traffic Investigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Ch. SL 2023-52 | |
2023-06-23 | Signed by Gov. 6/23/2023 | |
2023-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2023 | |
2023-06-15 | Ratified | |
2023-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-14 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2023-06-12 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-03-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Crimes
Education
Government Employees
Investigations
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Motor Vehicles
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Traffic Offenses
Crimes
Education
Government Employees
Investigations
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Motor Vehicles
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Traffic Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 499.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 166.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |