NC H1329 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-577
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-577
Summary
Consolidate Expunction Statutes.
Title
Consolidate Expunction Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Ch. SL 2009-577 | |
2009-09-10 | Signed By Gov. 9/10/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-08-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-07-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-09 | Amend Pending #1 | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Juvenile Justice, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1329 |