NC H132 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Ch. SL 2021-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile Code Rev's/CIP Recommendations.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Code Rev's/CIP Recommendations.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-06 Ch. SL 2021-100
2021-08-06 Signed by Gov. 8/6/2021
2021-07-27 Pres. To Gov. 7/27/2021
2021-07-26 Ratified
2021-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-07-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-07-21SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-23SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-14SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-24HousePlaced On Cal For 03/25/2021
2021-03-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-24HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-24HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H132
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H132v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H132v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H132v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H132v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H132v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1169/0/H132-PCS40178-CH-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H132-SMCH-1(CSCH-1)-v-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H132-SMCH-5(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H132-SMTT-64(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H132-SMTT-65(e2)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H132-SMTT-65(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/64
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/361

Bill Comments

feedback