NC H131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal Map Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Map Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019
2019-06-13 Ratified
2019-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S71 (Same As) 2019-02-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback