NC H130 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Ch. SL 2023-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Ch. SL 2023-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Choice/Solar Decommissioning Rqmts
Title
Energy Choice/Solar Decommissioning Rqmts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - A2 Cervania Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - A2 Cervania Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Ch. SL 2023-58 | |
2023-06-26 | House | Became Law W/o Signature |
2023-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2023 | |
2023-06-14 | Ratified | |
2023-06-13 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-13 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2023-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2023-06-12 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-03-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/15/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alternative Energy
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Deq
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Manufacturing
Municipalities
Pollution
Presented
Public
Ratified
Recycling
Remediation & Cleanup
Solid Waste
Title Change
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Waste Management
Administrative Rules
Alternative Energy
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Deq
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Manufacturing
Municipalities
Pollution
Presented
Public
Ratified
Recycling
Remediation & Cleanup
Solid Waste
Title Change
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Waste Management
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | 309.06 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.240 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.241 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.242 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.243 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 145.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 203.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |