NC H130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-10)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Ch. SL 2021-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

East Coast Greenway/State Trails

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

East Coast Greenway/State Trails

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Ch. SL 2021-54
2021-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2021
2021-06-16 Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2021
2021-06-15 Ratified
2021-06-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-14SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-08SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-24HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-10HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-24HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143B135.54(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H130
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H130v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H130v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H130v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H130v3.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-7(e1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-13(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-45(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-47(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-80(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H130-SMBR-80(sl)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/46
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/268

Bill Comments

feedback