NC H121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify EQIP Funding/Dredging Cost-Share
Title
Clarify EQIP Funding/Dredging Cost-Share
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Dana Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] |
Rep. Larry Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Ch. SL 2021-108 | |
2021-08-16 | Signed by Gov. 8/16/2021 | |
2021-08-13 | Pres. To Gov. 8/13/2021 | |
2021-08-12 | Ratified | |
2021-08-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-11 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-08-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-11 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-08-10 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Agriculture, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Commerce
Environment
Ferries
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Highway Fund
Infrastructure
Ports
Presented
Public
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Shallow Draft Inlet Dredging Fund
Title Change
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Water Resources
Budgeting
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Commerce
Environment
Ferries
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Highway Fund
Infrastructure
Ports
Presented
Public
Ratified
Rentals & Leasing
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Shallow Draft Inlet Dredging Fund
Title Change
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 215.73F | (n/a) | Citation Text |