NC H12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Address Pandemic Learning Loss/Counties
Title
Address Pandemic Learning Loss/Counties
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Ricky Hurtado [D] | Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Ball [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Deb Butler [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] | Sen. Rachel Hunt [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Joe John [D] |
Sen. Graig Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-01-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alamance County
Boards
Burlington
Calendar
Counties
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Guilford County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Secondary Education
Title Change
Boards
Burlington
Calendar
Counties
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Guilford County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Secondary Education
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |