NC H119 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Ch. SL 2017-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Ch. SL 2017-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Vacancy Elections - County Commission
Title
Clarify Vacancy Elections - County Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Ch. SL 2017-2 | |
2017-03-16 | Signed by Gov. 3/16/2017 | |
2017-03-08 | Pres. To Gov. 3/8/2017 | |
2017-03-07 | Ratified | |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-02-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/22/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-16 | House | Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |