NC H1181 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Failed Concur In S Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Failed Concur In S Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Medicaid Modernization
Title
North Carolina Medicaid Modernization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-30 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2014 |
2014-07-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-07-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-28 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2014 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2014 |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-07-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2014-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Filed |