NC H117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Competes Act
Title
NC Competes Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-23 - House - C RPT Adoption R3 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 78 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - House - C RPT Adoption R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A2 Tine Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A1 Waddell Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-09-22 - House - C RPT Adoption R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A2 Tine Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - A1 Waddell Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Ch. SL 2015-259 | |
2015-09-30 | Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015 | |
2015-09-25 | Pres. To Gov. 9/25/2015 | |
2015-09-24 | Ratified | |
2015-09-23 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-23 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2015-09-22 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/21/2015 |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Held As Material |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/22/2015 |
2015-09-18 | House | Ruled Material |
2015-09-18 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-27 | House | Conferees Changed |
2015-08-20 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-19 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-08-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-08-13 | House | Ruled Material |
2015-08-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-08-12 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-08-11 | Engrossed | |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-03-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/04/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |