NC H1169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Elect Thomasville City Bd. of Ed
Title
Elect Thomasville City Bd. of Ed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2022-06-23 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2022 |
2022-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Counties
Davidson County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Thomasville
Counties
Davidson County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Membership
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Thomasville
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 279 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 292 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 294.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |