NC H116 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flex./Certain School Systems
Title
School Calendar Flex./Certain School Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-04-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Asheboro
Boards
Calendar
Cleveland County
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Gaston County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Randolph County
Secondary Education
Boards
Calendar
Cleveland County
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Gaston County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Randolph County
Secondary Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |